+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died on inactive file.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lieu.
- From consent calendar.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4479.)
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On March 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
On February 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
May 6, 2014: Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 11
April 21, 2014: ACR 92 HALL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
April 9, 2014: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
March 24, 2014: Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor