+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 94, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On June 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1713.)
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2114.)
- Coauthors revised.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
June 26, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # ACR92
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2017: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor