+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On September 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6515.)
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 29).
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On August 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
On June 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On June 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
August 31, 2016: ACR 91 ALEJO Consent Calendar First Day
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2016: Be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor