+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2021.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On July 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2305.).
On July 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On July 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1806.)
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1956.)
- Coauthors revised.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 3).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (4)
July 12, 2021: ACR 90 Mathis Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
July 5, 2021: Special Consent ACR90
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 10, 2021: ACR 90 Mathis Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
June 3, 2021: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor