+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2013.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1203.)
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Ordered to third reading.
- From committee:
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1476.)
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 8).
On March 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Amended.
On February 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On January 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 30, 2013: Special Consent Cal AJR9 Dahle
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2013: AJR 9 DAHLE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 9
May 8, 2013: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7