+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4147.)
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5442.)
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 3).
On February 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
June 26, 2014: Special Consent #17 ACR89 Salas
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
April 3, 2014: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor