+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m.
On March 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2890.)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From committee:
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On February 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3785.)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 3).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On January 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR87 Wilk By Gaines
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 4
February 3, 2014: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor