+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m.
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2875.)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From committee:
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On February 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3784.)
On January 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 30).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On January 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2014: Special Consent #11 ACR86 Buchanan
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 7
January 30, 2014: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor