+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2204.)
On August 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2324.)
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 27, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd ACR78 Salas
- Yeas: 40
August 18, 2015: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
August 18, 2015: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
July 9, 2015: ACR 78 SALAS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
July 8, 2015: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 3
June 22, 2015: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
June 22, 2015: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor