+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2021.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On May 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1112.)
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1186.)
- Coauthors revised.
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
- From printer.
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR73
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
April 22, 2021: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor