+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2013.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:35 a.m.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 865.)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 23).
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 17. Page 699.)
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 19).
On February 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On January 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
May 9, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AJR7 Bonta By Yee
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 4
April 23, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
April 1, 2013: AJR 7 BONTA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 20
March 19, 2013: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor