+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1225.)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On May 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1420.)
- Coauthors revised.
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # ACR69
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
May 1, 2017: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (69)
Type:
Primary Sponsor