+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 6268.).
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 18).
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced.
+ − Vote
August 18, 2016: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2