+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Page 3429.).
- Coauthors revised.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 74(d) suspended. (Page 3090.)
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 5).
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced.
+ − Vote
September 5, 2019: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor