+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 78, Statutes of 2013.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 1684.)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 4).
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 1151.)
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On January 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On January 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 8, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AJR6 Fox By Block
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 8
June 4, 2013: Be adopted.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
April 29, 2013: AJR 6 FOX Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
April 15, 2013: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor