+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2013.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:50 p.m.
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 160.)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Ordered to third reading.
- From committee:
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On February 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 236.)
On January 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 31).
On January 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On January 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
February 15, 2013: Special Consent Cal ACR6 Donnelly
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 6
January 31, 2013: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (69)
Type:
Primary Sponsor