+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2968.).
On August 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 22).
On August 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On August 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced.
+ − Votes (2)
September 3, 2019: HR 54 Kamlager-Dove Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 22, 2019: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor