+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Page 6448.).
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 19).
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended.
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced.
+ − Vote
August 19, 2014: Be adopted as amended.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor