+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4905.).
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 19).
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On May 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced.
+ − Vote
May 19, 2016: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor