+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 198, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On September 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2930.)
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2255.)
- Coauthors revised.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
September 14, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR50 Chu et al. By Pan
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2017: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor