+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 856.)
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 25).
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2015: AJR 5 DAHLE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
April 9, 2015: AJR 5 DAHLE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
March 25, 2015: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1