+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1031.)
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 711.)
- Measure version as amended on March 25 corrected.
On March 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amended. Ordered to third reading.
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23).
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2015: Special Consent #1 ACR48 Cooley
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
March 23, 2015: Be adopted as amended.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor