+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 6873.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 5775.)
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On July 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 6056.)
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 6050.)
- Without reference to committee.
On June 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 29, 2018: AJR 46 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 64
- Present/NV: 16
August 27, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AJR46 Gonzalez Fletcher et al. By Hueso
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 6
August 14, 2018: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
July 2, 2018: AJR 46 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 66
- Present/NV: 14
+ − Sponsors (61)
Type:
Primary Sponsor