+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled measure version corrected.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 635.)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 770.)
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23).
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 16, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR44 Dodd By Wolk
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
March 23, 2015: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (76)
Type:
Primary Sponsor