+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1139.).
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 20).
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On February 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On January 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced.
+ − Vote
April 20, 2015: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1