+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On July 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2256.).
On July 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1756.)
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1016.)
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
On March 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On January 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On December 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On December 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
July 6, 2015: ACR 4 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 2, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd ACR4 Waldron
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 16, 2015: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
June 16, 2015: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
April 20, 2015: ACR 4 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 80
April 20, 2015: ACR 4 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 80
April 15, 2015: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2015: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2015: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor