+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4846.).
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 5).
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced.
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2014: HR 39 TING Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 7
May 5, 2014: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor