+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
On May 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4222.)
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4817.)
- Coauthors revised.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19).
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 21, 2018: Special Consent AJR37
- Yeas: 39
April 23, 2018: AJR 37 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 3
April 19, 2018: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (69)
Type:
Primary Sponsor