+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 36, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:35 p.m.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 804.)
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 843.)
- Coauthors revised.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 27).
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # ACR36
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
March 27, 2017: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (72)
Type:
Primary Sponsor