+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1075.)
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1126.)
- Coauthors revised.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 30).
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # ACR35
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
March 30, 2017: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (75)
Type:
Primary Sponsor