+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3243.)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4361.)
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2).
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
April 24, 2014: Special Consent #12 AJR34 Cooley
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 7, 2014: AJR 34 COOLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
April 2, 2014: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor