+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 26, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
On April 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3565.)
- In Senate.
On April 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4394.)
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14).
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
April 18, 2016: AJR 34 ACHADJIAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
April 18, 2016: W/O REF. TO FILE AJR34 Achadjian By De León
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 14, 2016: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor