+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 26, Statutes of 2019.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 477.)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 602.)
- Coauthors revised.
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 28).
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2019: Special Consent ACR33 Gloria et al.
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 3
February 28, 2019: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (66)
Type:
Primary Sponsor