+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 168, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
On August 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 0. Page 4921.)
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 4845.)
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (May 5).
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
August 27, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AJR32 Gatto By De León
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 16
May 8, 2014: AJR 32 GATTO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
May 5, 2014: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1