+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Page 2400.).
- Coauthors revised.
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Amended.
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25).
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Introduced.
+ − Vote
April 25, 2017: Be adopted as amended.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor