+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2021.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2242.)
On August 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1033.)
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 12).
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
On April 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (4)
August 30, 2021: Special Consent ACR32 Megan Dahle
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 24, 2021: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 3
April 15, 2021: ACR 32 Megan Dahle Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 3
April 12, 2021: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor