+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1075.)
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1006.)
- Coauthors revised.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6).
On January 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On December 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On December 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 15, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # AJR3
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2017: AJR 3 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 6, 2017: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (72)
Type:
Primary Sponsor