+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2013.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2111.)
On August 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From committee:
On August 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2589.)
On August 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8).
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On July 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
September 3, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AJR28 Brown By Wright
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
August 19, 2013: AJR 28 BROWN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 3
August 8, 2013: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor