+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 211, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6039.)
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 6706.)
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 20).
On August 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On August 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
August 30, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR274 Gabriel By Pan
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 20, 2018: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor