+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 423.)
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 557.)
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 9).
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR26 Levine By McGuire
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 8
March 9, 2015: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor