+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m.
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5704.)
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On July 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 6061.)
- Coauthors revised.
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21).
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
August 24, 2018: Special Consent ACR252
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 21, 2018: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor