+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 124, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On July 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5110.)
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5847.)
- Coauthors revised.
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
July 5, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR251 Gloria et al. By Pan
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 4
June 14, 2018: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (74)
Type:
Primary Sponsor