+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 200, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6872.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5807.)
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6257.)
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 29, 2018: ACR 234 RUBIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 27, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR234 Rubio et al. By Mitchell
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 13, 2018: ACR 234 RUBIO Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
August 8, 2018: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 26, 2018: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor