+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 140, Statutes of 2019.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2328.)
On August 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2663.)
- Coauthors revised.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11).
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
August 30, 2019: Special Consent ACR22
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
July 11, 2019: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (69)
Type:
Primary Sponsor