+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2021.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.)
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 624.)
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 4).
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 12, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR22 Boerner Horvath
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2021: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor