+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5824.)
- Coauthors revised.
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 4).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On August 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (2)
August 11, 2022: ACR 214 Fong Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 4, 2022: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor