+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2022.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6167.).
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4974.)
On August 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On August 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.)
- Coauthors revised.
On June 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
- From printer.
On June 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
August 24, 2022: ACR 208 Davies Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 23, 2022: Consent Calendar ACR208
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 10, 2022: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
June 30, 2022: ACR 208 Davies Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
June 27, 2022: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (69)
Type:
Primary Sponsor