+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3980.)
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4639.)
- Coauthors revised.
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading ACR208 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Dodd
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
April 9, 2018: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (74)
Type:
Primary Sponsor