+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2022.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4717.)
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate.
- Coauthors revised.
On June 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23).
On June 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
- From printer.
On June 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
August 11, 2022: Special Consent ACR207
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 23, 2022: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor