+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2230.)
On August 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 724.)
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 20).
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
On January 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On December 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On December 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 24, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd ACR2
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 11, 2017: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
March 23, 2017: ACR 2 MAYES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
March 20, 2017: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor